HI HB1671 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1391).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes time limits on rendering administrative and judicial review decisions. Limits protests to those that are a minimum percentage of the contract value. Requires posting of a protest bond, to be forfeited if the protesting party does not prevail. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement Code; Protest; Administrative Proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-10 (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1391).
2012-07-10 (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1391).
2012-06-25 (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-25-12 (Gov. Msg. No. 1253)
2012-06-25 (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1253)
2012-04-23 (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 644).
2012-04-20 (H) Transmitted to Governor.
2012-04-20 (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with Representative(s) Ching, Marumoto, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki excused (1).
2012-04-20 (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2012-04-20 (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 633).
2012-04-19 (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-12
2012-04-17 (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 758).
2012-04-17 (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Hee, Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
2012-04-13 (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547).
2012-04-12 (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2012-04-10 (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 533) in amended form (SD 2).
2012-04-10 (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2012-04-05 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12.
2012-04-05 (S) Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3321) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2012-04-03 (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Tokuda, Wakai.
2012-04-03 (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2012-03-30 (S) The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-12 10:30AM in conference room 016.
2012-03-23 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
2012-03-23 (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2965) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM.
2012-03-20 (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2012-03-15 (S) Re-Referred to PGM, JDL/WAM.
2012-03-14 (S) The committee on PGM has rescheduled its decision making to 03-20-12 3:15PM in conference room 224.
2012-03-13 (S) The committee(s) on PGM deferred the measure until 03-20-12 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2012-03-09 (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-12 2:50PM in conference room 224.
2012-03-08 (S) Referred to PGM, JDL.
2012-03-08 (S) Passed First Reading.
2012-03-08 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 58).
2012-03-06 (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Rhoads voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2012-03-02 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12.
2012-03-02 (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 922-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2012-02-28 (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2012-02-24 (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-12 11:30AM in House conference room 308.
2012-02-02 (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Okamura excused (1).
2012-02-02 (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 53-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2012-01-24 (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine.
2012-01-20 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 01-24-12 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2012-01-18 (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 1
2012-01-18 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2012-01-11 (H) Prefiled

Hawaii State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1671
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1671_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1671_HD1_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/HB1671_HD1_HSCR53-12_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1671_HD2_PROPOSED_.htm
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1671_HD2_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/HB1671_HD2_HSCR922-12_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1671_SD1_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/HB1671_SD1_SSCR2965_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1671_SD2_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/HB1671_SD2_SSCR3321_.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback