HI HB1669 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows proposals to be submitted for concessions on public property. Establishes criteria for acceptance and awarding of proposals for concessions on public property. Specifies advertising requirements for bids or proposals and allows for online advertising. Requires that concession contracts be awarded by a procurement officer based on the rankings of a committee of a minimum of three individuals designated by the procurement officer to review and evaluate proposals from offerors. Requires that all persons involved in the review, evaluation, or awarding of concession contracts adhere to all requirements of ethical public procurement under section 103D101, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Takes effect on 7/1/2030. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Concessions On Public Property.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681). |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:30PM in conference room 429. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 10:40AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 669). |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 832). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Galuteria. |
2018-04-24 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representatives Johanson, Yamane, Takumi added as Co-Chairs. Representative Luke discharged as Chair; Added as Co-Chair. |
2018-04-24 | House | Re-referred to LAB/WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 65 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Aquino, Cullen, Tupola. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 600) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Inouye). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3522) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 10:50AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3099) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-18 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 270). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Yamane excused (2). |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1029-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole. |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-01 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to LAB/WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-11 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2147 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.