HI HB1666 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that all state and county letterheads, emblems, and symbols, when newly created, replaced, reprinted, or otherwise revised, contain the accurate, appropriate, and authentic Hawaiian names and language. (HB1666 HD1)
Title
Hawaiian Language; Letterheads; Emblems; Symbols
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Hermina Morita [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 304). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Takai excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 929), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2009-03-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-09 10:30AM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, McKelvey, Takai, Takumi, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 576) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Shimabukuro, Belatti, Brower, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Bertram, Mizuno. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 02-18-09 9:10am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to HAW, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |