HI HB1656 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the manner of serving summons within the State for a civil action. Effective January 1, 2100. (HB1656 HD1)
Title
Service of Process
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 233). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Woodson excused (2). |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 647-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Wooley. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-13 | House | Prefiled |