HI HB1654 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1345).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1345).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Terminates a conditional use permit issued by a county agency to facilities intended for group living facilities or group homes that do not use the permits or cease operations for one year. (HB1654 CD1)
Title
Termination of Permits; Group Homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1345). | |
2011-07-12 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1345). | |
2011-06-27 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-27-11 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-06-27 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Hee. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 70). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 70) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-26 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Mizuno, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Chang, Cabanilla. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-11 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-20-11 1:35PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Mizuno, Chang Co-Chairs; Cabanilla, Ching. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Re-referred to HLT, HUS, WLO, referral sheet 58 | |
2011-03-31 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 365). | |
2011-03-29 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 380) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-28 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Hee). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-28-11. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from HTH/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 872) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ryan, Slom. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Referred to HTH/PGM. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 36). | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Ching, C. Lee, McKelvey, Saiki, Takumi excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 687), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Chong, Morita, Nakashima, Thielen. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 02-25-11 11:15AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLO with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 489) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLO. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ching. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-15-11 10:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Re-referred to HLT, WLO, referral sheet 13 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, WLO, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |