HI HB1650 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the preparation of absentee ballots for counting may include opening the return envelope in which the ballot is enclosed and the validation of signatures, but shall not include opening the ballot envelope. Allows official election observers to be present during this process. Requires that, unless otherwise stated, the opening of return absentee ballot envelopes and signature validation commence the day immediately after ballots are transmitted to voters through election day. Provides that the counting of absentee ballots may begin no earlier than fifteen days prior to an election and establishes stages of absentee ballot counting. Prohibits persons present during the counting of absentee ballots from disclosing the results. Allows, rather than requires, observation of ballot handling by an official.
Title
Office of Elections Package; Elections; Absentee; Return Ballots
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2113 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1650&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1650_.HTM |