HI SB2113 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the preparation of absentee ballots for counting may include opening the return envelope in which the ballot is enclosed and the validation of signatures, but shall not include opening the ballot envelope. Allows official election observers to be present during this process. Requires that, unless otherwise stated, the opening of return absentee ballot envelopes and signature validation commence the day immediately after ballots are transmitted to voters through election day. Provides that the counting of absentee ballots may begin no earlier than the fifteenth day prior to an election and establishes stages of absentee ballot counting. Prohibits persons present during the counting of absentee ballots from disclosing the results. Allows, rather than requires, observation of ballot handling by an official. Allows defective ballots to be replaced with new ballots by counting center employees without the presence of at least two official observers. Establishes a misdemeanor for any person who wilfully causes the results of any absentee ballot count to become publicly known before the polls have officially closed. (SD1)
Title
Office of Elections Package; Elections; Absentee; Return Ballots
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 104) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Deferred until 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2652) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2393) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-16-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1650 (Same As) 2016-01-25 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1