HI HB1649 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Judiciary for FY 2016-2017. (HB1649 HD1)
Title
Judiciary Package; Supplemental Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 509-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-16 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Woodson. |
2016-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-16-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2102 (Same As) 2016-04-20 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.