HI SB2102 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To adjust and request appropriations for FY 201617 funding requirements for operations and capital improvement projects of the Judiciary.
Title
Judiciary supplemental budget. ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Dela Cruz. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Luke Co-Chairs; Nishimoto, McDermott. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 511). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1694-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-06 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2016-04-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1289-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2016-03-21 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-17 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2016-03-17 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 356) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-16-16. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2868) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1649 (Same As) 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).