HI HB1631 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Vetoed on 06-22-20 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1102).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Vetoed on 06-22-20 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1102).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of general obligation bonds. Authorizes issuance of instruments of indebtedness in an amount that may be necessary to finance any permitted purpose under the House Bill No. 2200, H.D. 1, S.D. 1 and section 13(3) of the Federal Reserve Act. Makes findings required by article VII, section 13, of the state constitution regarding the issuance of authorized bonds and the debt limit. (HB1631 SD1)
Title
Relating To State Bonds.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Vetoed on 06-22-20 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1102). |
2020-06-23 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1102). |
2020-05-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 361). |
2020-05-21 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen excused (2). |
2020-05-21 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Received notice of House intent to agree (Hse. Com. No. 360) |
2020-05-18 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 529) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 05-18-20. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3513) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Shimabukuro. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 05-13-20 10:30AM in conference room Auditorium. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 05-11-20 10:30AM in conference room Auditorium. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 7). |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Lowen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-14 | House | Deferred one day 02-18-20. |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 472-20), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled. |