HI HB1631 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits physician-dispensed prescription drugs in workers' compensation claims to an unspecified number of days from the work injury date. Lowers the reimbursement rates of prescription drugs in workers' compensation claims.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation Prescription Drug Reimbursement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 123-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-01-30 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-30-18 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2358 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.