HI HB163 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Office of Veterans' Services, with the assistance of the Department of Accounting and General Services, Department of Defense, and State Historic Preservation Division, to develop a plan to establish a memorial honoring the veterans of the Persian Gulf War, Operation Desert Storm, Operation Iraqi Freedom, Operation Enduring Freedom, and Operation New Dawn. Requires a report to the Legislature. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB163 HD1)
Title
Memorial; Persian Gulf War; Operation Desert Storm; Operation Iraqi Freedom; Operation Enduring Freedom; Operation New Dawn
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 66) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-01-30 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 01-30-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB551 (Same As) 2013-06-25 - Act 139, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242).