HI HB1629 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-07 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-07 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Director of Transportation, rather than the counties, to regulate mopeds. Requires owners of mopeds and motor scooters to register them with the State and obtain license plates.
Title
Motor Vehicle Regulation; Mopeds; Motor Scooters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-07 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-07-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1629 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB1629_.HTM |