HI HB1626 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 193, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 193, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits liability for volunteers maintaining or repairing cemetery grounds. Requires the director of commerce and consumer affairs, in consultation with the comptroller, to develop strategies for the upkeep, repair, and maintenance of Sunset Memorial Park in Pearl City, Oahu. Requires report to legislature. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Cemeteries.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 193, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 193, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302). |
2018-04-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 696). |
2018-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Thielen, Tupola excused (3). |
2018-04-27 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 683). |
2018-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-10-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Nishimoto, Cachola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 11:05AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Nishihara. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Nishimoto, Cachola Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 57 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 546). |
2018-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 557) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-06-18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3514) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3073) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 48). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 800-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2018-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 135-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2082 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Cemetery
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Limited Liability
Maintenance
Repairs
Sunset Memorial Park
Volunteers
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Limited Liability
Maintenance
Repairs
Sunset Memorial Park
Volunteers