HI HB1618 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Penal Code to establish the crime of sexual assault of an animal. Provides that the sexual assault of an animal is a class C felony or a class B felony if the offense subjects a minor to sexual contact with an animal or is committed in the presence of a minor.
Title
Relating To The Sexual Assault Of An Animal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2718 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to AGR, JUD , referral sheet 36
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1618&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1618_.HTM |