HI HB1613 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-4)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - (H) Act 142, on 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-4)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - (H) Act 142, on 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an application to register to vote in person or by mail to include a space to request a permanent absentee ballot. Removes time limit on requesting an absentee or permanent absentee ballot but not later than 4:30 p.m. on the seventh day prior to the election. Permits the office of elections to continue to use its existing voter registration application forms where possible until such time as new forms are developed and printed. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB1613 CD1)
Title
Permanent Absentee Voting; Voter Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | (H) Act 142, on 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245). | |
2011-06-21 | (S) Act 142, 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245). | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, M. Oshiro, Pine, Takumi excused (4). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 114). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 114) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Choy, Luke, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 8:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-11 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-11 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Kim. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Keith-Agaran, Choy Co-Chairs; Luke, Thielen. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 595) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1108) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-11 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 347). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 707), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-11 12:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Nakashima excused (2). | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 396) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Luke, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, Ito, McKelvey. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-10-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |