HI HB1608 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Health to implement a program for wholesale importation of prescription drugs. Requires the Department to contract with a licensed wholesaler to seek federal certification and approval for the program. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Prescription Drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 315-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in House conference room 320. |
2020-02-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 26-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-01-28 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura, Say, Tokioka; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-28-20 8:35AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-09 | House | Prefiled. |