HI HB1600 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts and requests appropriations for fiscal biennium 2021-2023 funding requirements for operations and capital improvement projects of executive branch agencies and programs. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The State Budget.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216) |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216) |
2022-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 947). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 209-22). |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 209-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Tam, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama. |
2022-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-22 1:30PM in conference room 309. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 872). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 869) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-22. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 5 offered. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3896) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-22 10:45AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 04-05-22 10:45AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-22 10:45AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 358). |
2022-03-16 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1027-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-03-10 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-10-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Governor re: Proposed changes (Gov. Msg. No. 11). |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2176 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - Referred to WAM.