HI HB16 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB16
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the Interstate Compact to Phase Out Corporate Welfare.
Title
Relating To An Interstate Compact To Phase Out Corporate Welfare.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB531 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB16 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB16 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=16&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB16_.HTM |