HI HB1583 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires condominium associations to allow members or their proxies to vote by mail and attend and cast votes in association meetings through the internet, teleconference, or other electronic transmission technology. Ensures the provision of copies of printed audit trails.
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-03-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2852 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to CPC, referral sheet 24
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1583&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1583_.HTM |