HI HB1581 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1581
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes the personal use of cannabis for persons twenty-one years of age or older. Requires licensing to operate cannabis establishments. Subjects cannabis establishment to excise taxes. Authorizes the interisland transportation of cannabis. Decriminalizes possession of cannabis. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Cannabis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1581 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1581&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1581_.HTM |