HI HB1580 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Failed to pass Third Reading. Ayes, 11; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey, Shimabukuro, Wakai . Noes, 14 (Senator(s) Aquino, Awa, Chang, DeCoite, Fevella, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Keohokalole, Kidani, Kim, Kouchi, Richards, San Buenaventura). Excused, 0 (none).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Failed to pass Third Reading. Ayes, 11; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey, Shimabukuro, Wakai . Noes, 14 (Senator(s) Aquino, Awa, Chang, DeCoite, Fevella, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Keohokalole, Kidani, Kim, Kouchi, Richards, San Buenaventura). Excused, 0 (none).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the criminal penalties for various animal cruelty offenses by increasing the category of offense. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Animal Cruelty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Failed to pass Third Reading. Ayes, 11; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey, Shimabukuro, Wakai . Noes, 14 (Senator(s) Aquino, Awa, Chang, DeCoite, Fevella, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Keohokalole, Kidani, Kim, Kouchi, Richards, San Buenaventura). Excused, 0 (none). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-09-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3478) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 186). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett, Holt, Kahaloa, Lowen, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Todd excused (9). |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 652-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden, Souza; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-21-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |