HI HB1578 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Act 199, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the offense of theft of urn as a class C felony. Requires scrap dealers to follow the same requirements regarding a written statement for the purchase of an urn as they do for the purchase of copper or a beer keg. (HB1578 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urn; Theft; Penal Code; Class C Felony; Scrap Dealers; Statement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-06SenateAct 199, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).
2016-07-07HouseAct 199, on 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).
2016-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2016-05-05SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
2016-05-04HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
2016-05-03HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2016-05-03SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2016-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
2016-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 60-16).
2016-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16.
2016-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 60-16) as amended in (CD 1).
2016-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K.Kahele, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2016-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Rhoads, Woodson, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2016-04-22HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 1:35PM in conference room 016.
2016-04-20HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 1:45PM in conference room 016.
2016-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
2016-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652).
2016-04-18HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Woodson, Fukumoto Chang.
2016-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; K.Kahele, Shimabukuro.
2016-04-15SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2016-04-14HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2016-04-12HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 518) in amended form (SD 1).
2016-04-12SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
2016-04-08Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16.
2016-04-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2016-04-08SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3463) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2016-04-06SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele, L. Thielen, Slom.
2016-04-05SenateThe committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-06-16 9:15AM in conference room 016.
2016-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-16 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2016-03-11SenateRe-Referred to JDL.
2016-03-10SenateReferred to CPH, JDL.
2016-03-10SenatePassed First Reading.
2016-03-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 192).
2016-03-08HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2016-03-04HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
2016-03-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 936-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2016-02-25HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nakashima.
2016-02-24HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2016-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-25-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2016-02-11HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2).
2016-02-11HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 148-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2016-02-03HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, C. Lee, Oshiro.
2016-02-01HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-03-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2016-02-01HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-03-16 2:00PM.
2016-01-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-01-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2016-01-25HouseReferred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 1
2016-01-20HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2016-01-15HousePrefiled.

Same As/Similar To

SB3080 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 26

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback