HI HB1574 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1574
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Public Utilities Commission to establish a tiered energy savings rate structure for customers of electric utilities. Allows the Commission to establish discounted rates for low-income customers of electric utilities. Reforms the public benefits fee. Allows the fee to be used to benefit energy efficiency advancement for low- and middle-income ratepayers and for emergency energy workforce retraining and transition programs. Authorizes the department of taxation to disclose tax return information to the public utilities commission in accordance with the purposes of this Act and applies penalties for intentional disclosure of the tax return information. (HB1574 HD1)
Title
Relating To Energy Rates.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 218) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2017-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-17. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-02-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1574 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.