HI HB1569 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the taxation of the pension income of: (1) an individual filer with federal adjusted gross income of $100,000 or more; (2) a joint or surviving spouse filer with federal adjusted gross income of $200,000 or more; and (3) a head of household with federal adjusted gross income of $150,000 or more. Effective for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013.
Title
Taxation; Pension Income; Income Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-09 | House | Prefiled |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1569&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1569_.HTM |