HI HB1565 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the number of members of the State Rehabilitation Council from twenty-one to fifteen.
Title
Membership; State Rehabilitation Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Referred to HMS. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 33). | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Ching, McKelvey, Saiki, Takumi excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen excused (10). | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 611), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Pine. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-07-11 9:35AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to HUS, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1417 (Same As)