HI HB1560 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-22 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-22 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the LUC to include, in conditional approvals of boundary changes, a date by which the boundary change is no longer valid if the conditions have not been met.
Title
LUC; Boundary Change; Conditions; Expiration Date
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-22 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-01-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 01-22-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-09 | House | Prefiled |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1560&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1560_.HTM |