HI HB1557 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1557
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Family Self-Sufficiency Program to provide matching funds to enable tenants of certain public housing dwelling units to purchase housing units. Authorizes the Hawaii Public Housing Authority to impose maximum rental periods and conditions of tenancy for tenants participating in the Family-Self Sufficiency Program. Amends general tenancy termination requirements, selection priorities and minimum rents for HPHA housing projects. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Public Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1106 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB1557 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1557 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1557&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1557_.HTM |