HI HB1557 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1557
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Family Self-Sufficiency Program to provide matching funds to enable tenants of certain public housing dwelling units to purchase housing units. Authorizes the Hawaii Public Housing Authority to impose maximum rental periods and conditions of tenancy for tenants participating in the Family-Self Sufficiency Program. Amends general tenancy termination requirements, selection priorities and minimum rents for HPHA housing projects. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Public Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1557 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1106 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
SB1106 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1557&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1557_.HTM |