HI HB1542 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to LMG, JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to LMG, JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each house of the legislature to establish by its rule, procedures that enables the legislature to use remote testimony at legislative committee hearings, enable the public to present oral testimony at legislative committee hearings through remote testimony, and accommodate persons with disabilities though remote testimony. Defines "remote testimony".
Title
Relating To Legislative Access Through Remote Testimony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to LMG, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2436 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Re-Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Deaf and Blind Task Force
Legislative Access
Remote Legislative Committee Hearings
Remote Testimony
State Legislature
Legislative Access
Remote Legislative Committee Hearings
Remote Testimony
State Legislature
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1542&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1542_.HTM |