HI HB1539 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 875).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Oahu regional system board approval to privatize, sell or change services at all Oahu regional health care system facilities. Amends the membership of the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation board. Requires the Oahu regional system board to create a 5-year sustainability plan in consultation with other government stakeholders and report to the Legislature. Creates a right of first refusal for the Director of Health, Governor's Coordinator on Homelessness, and Mayor of the City and County of Honolulu if the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation board fully or partially privatizes Leahi or Maluhia Hospital. Sunsets the Oahu regional health care system on 7/1/2024 and integrates it into the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation Board. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 875).
2019-04-26HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-24HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 960).
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-24SenateSenate Conferees Changed: Senator Nishihara added as Conferee. Senator S. Chang discharged as Conferee.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; S. Chang, L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Ward.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 873) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Ihara, K. Rhoads. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) S. Chang, Taniguchi). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1933) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-19 10:45AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1525) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) S. Chang; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 130).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Perruso, San Buenaventura, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 818), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Todd.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
2019-02-12HouseDeferred one day 02-13-19.
2019-02-12HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 275) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-07HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Tokioka; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
2019-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback