HI HB1533 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Mizuno, Oshiro excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Mizuno, Oshiro excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prioritizes the expenditure of moneys from the Agricultural Development and Food Security Special Fund for the growth and development in the State of food for humans and feed for animals. (HB1533 HD2)
Title
Food; Agricultural Development and Food Security Special Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Mizuno, Oshiro excused (4). |
2014-02-12 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 376-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-02-07 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Kawakami, Fale; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Say; and Excused: none. |
2014-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-07-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 141-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2014-01-30 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-30-14 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2014-01-27 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-30-14 at 9:00am. |
2014-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 01-27-14 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2014-01-23 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-27-14 at 9:00am. |
2014-01-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 01-23-14 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled |