HI HB153 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB153
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the director of finance of a county to require payment of outstanding charges owed to the county for the towing, removal, or disposal of an abandoned or derelict vehicle within the county before issuing a motor vehicle certificate of registration.
Title
Relating To Registration Of Vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB153 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB424 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
SB424 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=153&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB153_.HTM |