HI HB152 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts Uniform Partition of Heirs Property Act. Establishes procedures and remedies for use in actions for partition of real property involving heirs property (real property held in tenancy in common that meets certain requirements). (HB152 HD2)
Title
Real Property; Partition; Heirs Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 151). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Choy, Har, Jordan, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 826) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Nakashima. |
2015-02-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-15 at 2:00 PM in room 325. |
2015-02-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-24-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-20 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-24-15 at 2:00 PM in room 325. |
2015-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-20-15 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1). |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 139) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-04 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-02-03 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-04-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-15. |
2015-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 01-29-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-29-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB134 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.