HI HB1516 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Act 078, 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1179).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits duly incorporated humane societies and duly incorporated societies for the prevention of cruelty to animals to petition for full custody of an impounded pet animal or equine animal prior to the filing of certain criminal charges against the owner or custodian of the pet animal or equine animal. Allows a pet animal or equine animal to be destroyed by the petitioner prior to final disposition of certain criminal charges if the pet animal or equine animal is a danger to itself or others. Clarifies that an acquittal or dismissal in a criminal proceeding does not preclude civil proceedings under animal cruelty offenses. (HB1516 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Animal Forfeiture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06SenateAct 078, 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1179).
2017-07-06HouseAct 078, on 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1179).
2017-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 35).
2017-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 35) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Nishimoto, Gates, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 11:00AM in conference room 224.
2017-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 11:00AM in conference room 224.
2017-04-20HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-24-17 9:00AM in conference room 224.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Gabbard, K. Rhoads.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Creagan, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Gates, Thielen.
2017-04-13HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2017-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 665) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-04-11SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Shimabukuro . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Tokuda). Transmitted to House.
2017-04-06Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
2017-04-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2017-04-06SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1460) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2017-03-31SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2017-03-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-17 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to JDL.
2017-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 361).
2017-03-07HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-03HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
2017-03-03HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 987) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-02-23HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-23-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2017-02-09HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
2017-02-09HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 145), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2017-02-03HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-02-02HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2017-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-03-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2017-01-30HouseReferred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 6
2017-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback