HI HB1512 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes performance-based regulation of electric utility companies by the Public Utilities Commission. (HB1512 HD2)
Title
Public Utilities Commission; Electric Utility Companies; Performance-Based Regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 552) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Yamane, McDermott. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-18-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1). |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 185) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-10-15 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-15. |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-05-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |