HI HB1510 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to install centerline road rumble strips along the Honoapiilani highway.
Title
Highways; Road Rumble Strips; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 459), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-14-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1510 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB1510_.HTM |