HI HB1505 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the Public Utilities Commission from approving power purchase agreements that prohibit the sale of renewable energy to third parties or require utility consent to sell renewable energy to third parties, to the extent that such renewable energy will be converted from electrical energy to another form of energy such as chemical or thermal energy, or to the extent that such renewable energy will be stored for later provision to an electric utility company. Requires fair compensation to be paid to an electric utility company when curtailed renewable energy is sold by an independent power producer to a third party on the electrical grid. Eff. 7/1/2112. (HD2)
Title
Public Utilities Commission; Power Purchase Agreements; Curtailed Energy
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 537) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Yamane, McDermott. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-18-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1). |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 124) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-02-05 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-05-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB698 (Same As) 2015-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.