HI HB1504 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a joint hearing mechanism in the facilitated application process for building permits, and limits the liability of public entities or employees for issuing a building permit for a project that has been properly stamped and signed by a qualified professional.
Title
Application; Building Permit; Facilitated Application Process
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 02-04-11 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1418 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1504 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1504_.HTM |