HI HB1502 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Branco, Kapela, McKelvey, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Holt, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Okimoto, Perruso voting no (5) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Branco, Kapela, McKelvey, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Holt, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Okimoto, Perruso voting no (5) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a defendant who has been convicted of four misdemeanors in any business district or an area zoned for resort or resort-hotel use by the appropriate county decision-making authority to be sentenced to a probationary term of geographic restriction that prohibits the defendant from entering the district or area. Mandates imprisonment of thirty days upon conviction. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Safe Neighborhoods.
Sponsors
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Branco, Kapela, McKelvey, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Holt, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Okimoto, Perruso voting no (5) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 406-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Belatti, Onishi, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Holt, Sayama; 2 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Okimoto; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-11-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to ECD, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2686 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Business Districts
Geographic Restriction
Misdemeanor Conviction
Probation
Resort Areas
Safe Neighborhoods
Geographic Restriction
Misdemeanor Conviction
Probation
Resort Areas
Safe Neighborhoods