HI HB1501 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates moneys for the acquisition of Molokai Ranch. Requires that lands acquired pursuant to this Act be held in the public land trust.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Molokai Ranch.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-01HouseThe committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 02-01-19 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback