HI HB1499 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1499
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:15PM in Conference Room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:15PM in Conference Room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Parts I through IV: clarifies the process, including payment obligations, mediation requirements, and triggers for further default, where a condominium unit owner and association reach a payment plan to resolve a nonjudicial foreclosure; establishes procedures that provide condominium owners with the right to submit disputed legal fees, penalties or fines, late fees, lien filing fees, or other charges, except for common expense assessments, to the mediation process prior to payment; and makes conforming amendments. Part V: expands the scope of the condominium education trust fund to cover voluntary binding arbitration between interested parties; amends the conditions that mandate mediation and exceptions to mandatory mediation. Takes effect 1/7/2059. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Condominium Associations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:15PM in Conference Room 016. |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 11:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi Co-Chairs; Nishihara, K. Rhoads. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Cachola Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 663) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1463) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1099) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 202). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 917), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 588) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-17. |
2017-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-09-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1499 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:15PM in Conference Room 016.
Subjects
Arbitration
Common Expense Assessments
Condominium Associations
Condominium Education Trust Fund
Condominiums
Cure of Default
Disputed Charges
Mediation
Owners
Common Expense Assessments
Condominium Associations
Condominium Education Trust Fund
Condominiums
Cure of Default
Disputed Charges
Mediation
Owners