HI HB1499 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a statewide literacy program under DHS. Allows direct services to be provided by existing programs and nonprofits. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Family Literacy; Department of Human Services; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] |
Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-12-15 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1337 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HMS, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1499&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1499_.HTM |