HI HB1490 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain diesel-powered electrical power generators to be equipped with diesel particulate filters that remove no less than 85% of the particulate matter.
Title
Electrical Power Generators; Diesel-powered; Filters
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-10 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-11-14 8:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2548 (Same As) 2014-01-30 - The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1490&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1490_.HTM |