HI HB149 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act 076, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1178).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act 076, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1178).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that cards issued by a county for the purposes of paying transit fares and county fees and other uses are not subject to the State's unfair and deceptive practices regulations related to gift certificates. Effective 1/1/2022. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Gift Certificates.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Act 076, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1178). |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Act 076, 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1178). |
2021-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-22 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2021-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-13-21. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 578). |
2021-04-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 807). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; Misalucha. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 495). |
2021-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 623) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-21. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1554) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1018) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 188). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 930), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 302) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-04 | House | Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB430 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to PSM, CPN.