HI HB1489 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1489

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-06 - Act 110, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1211).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits discrimination on the basis of sex, including gender identity or expression, or sexual orientation, in any state educational program or activity, or in any educational program or activity that receives state financial assistance. Requires the Legislative Reference Bureau to study how other jurisdictions oversee Title IX enforcement. Effective 1/1/2020, except study effective 7/1/2018. (HB1489 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Civil Rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-06SenateAct 110, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1211).
2018-07-06HouseAct 110, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1211).
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
2018-05-02HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2018-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
2018-05-01SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).
2018-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
2018-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 150-18).
2018-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
2018-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 150-18) as amended in (CD 1).
2018-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Taniguchi, English, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Nishimoto, Luke, Ichiyama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2018-04-27HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 10:30am in Conference Room 329.
2018-04-26SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 677).
2018-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
2018-04-25HouseHouse Conferees Added: Representative Luke added as Co-Chair.
2018-04-25HouseRe-referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 66
2018-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
2018-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
2018-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:00AM in conference room 329.
2018-04-20HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
2018-04-20HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804).
2018-04-20SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; English, K. Rhoads.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Yamashita, McDermott.
2018-04-13SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
2018-04-12HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-10HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 589) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-04-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-06Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18.
2018-04-06SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3589) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2018-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 9:15AM in conference room 016.
2018-03-28SenateRe-Referred to LBR, JDC.
2018-03-23SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2018-03-23SenateReported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3183) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2018-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-18 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2018-03-16SenateRe-Referred to LBR, JDC/WAM.
2018-01-17SenateRe-Referred to LBR/JDC, WAM.
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-03-22SenateThe committee on JDL deferred the measure.
2017-03-17SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to JDL, WAM.
2017-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 358).
2017-03-07HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-03HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1051), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-02-28HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2017-02-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2017-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
2017-02-17HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 693) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2017-02-14HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
2017-01-30HouseReferred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 6
2017-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB1265 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC.
HB1489 (Carry Over) 2017-03-22 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback