HI HB1484 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1484
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-16-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-16-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of assault in the second degree if a person intentionally or knowingly causes bodily injury to a health care professional, as defined in section 451D-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, who is engaged in the performance of duty at the time of the assault. (HB1484 HD2)
Title
Relating To Assault.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-16-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 357). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1036) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 512) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1484 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-16-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.