HI HB1481 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates public funding program of candidates for the offices of state representative. Repeals provisions under the existing partial public financing program specifically applicable to candidates for the offices of governor, lieutenant governor, state senator, and state representative pertaining to campaign expenditure limits, maximum amounts of public funding, and minimum amounts of qualifying contributions. Appropriates funds to the campaign spending commission to prepare for the public financing of elections in 2016, including staff support. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
Campaign Spending Commission; Partial Public Financing; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 325. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 4:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Kouchi, Shimabukuro. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Rhoads, Luke Co-Chairs; Kawakami, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 590) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Gabbard, Nishihara, Taniguchi . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1382) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1015) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 10:05AM in conference room 16. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 370). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan, McKelvey, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Har, Oshiro voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 763) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 577) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Carroll, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla, McDermott; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Kawakami, Thielen. |
2013-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-13 2:02PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-13. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-12-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-13 at 2:00PM. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-05-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1352 (Same As) 2013-01-28 - Referred to JDL, WAM.