HI HB1474 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Office of Hawaiian Affairs' pro rata share of the moneys derived from the public land trust. Transfers moneys to the Office of Hawaiian Affairs for income and proceeds due from the use of the public land trust lands between July 1, 2012, and June 30, 2022, that was misallocated, underreported, or underpaid to the Office of Hawaiian Affairs.
Title
Relating To Increasing The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs' Pro Rata Share Of The Public Land Trust.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2122 (Same As) 2022-02-22 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1474&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1474_.HTM |