HI HB1465 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 184, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1298).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 184, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1298).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends statutory language on liquor license application and operating procedures for clarity. (HB1465 CD1)
Title
Relating To Liquor.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Act 184, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1298). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Act 184, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1298). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 137). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 137) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Cachola, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Ward. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-26-17 3:30PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 707). |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; S. Chang, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Cachola Co-Chairs; Fukumoto, Todd, Ward. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 657) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1543) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from PSM/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1117) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-17 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPH, JDL. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 354). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1009) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 474) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-17. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-07-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1291 (Same As) 2017-03-09 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27